Gaines v. CA Dept. of Corrections, et al.
Plaintiff: Thurman Gaines
Defendant: Calif. Dept. of Corrections, L.D. Zamora, T. Byers, Horowitz, Robert Rudas, S. Cornell, Greenwall and Mayberry
Case Number: 1:2015cv00587
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER VACATING 107 Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Produce Inmate Victor W. Cooper, CDCR #E-35305 on November 13, 2020 Via Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/10/2020. (This order served on Litigation Coordinator at CSP-Corcoran via email.) (Marrujo, C)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File an Opposition or Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Continue the Evidentiary Hearing on or Before November 6, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Inmate Darrell E. Harris, CDCR #AB7852, Via Video Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2020. (Rivera, O)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING 97 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motions for Attendance of Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/2020. Deadline to file motions for attendance of witnesses is EXTENDED to 10/15/2020. Any opposition is due on or before 10/22/2020. (Rivera, O)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING TO DETERMINE DISPUTED ISSUES OF FACT REGARDING EXHAUSTION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES; ORDERED that a separate order and writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum for Plaintiffs attendance at the hearing will be issued in due course,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/15/2020. ( Evidentiary Hearing VIA ZOOM set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ADOPTING 87 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 77 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Exhaustion Grounds; and ORDER Referring Matter for Albino Evidentiary Hearing signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/15/2020. (Jessen, A)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 77 Motion for Summary Judgment on Non-Exhaustion Grounds, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/19. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting Defendant's 85 Request to Stay Discovery and to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/26/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for Appointment of Counsel or Guardian Ad Litem 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/15/2019: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING 63 Motion to Appoint Counsel as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/12/18. (Marrujo, C)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion for terminating sanctions, filed on December 18, 2017 49 , be DENIED; Plaintiff be prohibited from supporting his case or opposing Defendant's defenses with any evidence not disclosed to Defendant's exhaustion interrogatories or requests for production of documents; referred to Judge O'Neill,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/22/2018. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Third 57 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/23/2018. (Flores, E)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 40 Motion for Sanctions, without prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/2017. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/20/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 33 Motion to Compel and 37 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Modifying 28 Discovery and Scheduling Order; Granting Defendant's 29 Motion, signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/9/16. (Gonzalez, R)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 08/03/2016. (Flores, E)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SERVICE ORDER, signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/1/16. (Verduzco, M)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Request for Copy of First Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/1/16. (Verduzco, M)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/20/15: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. CA Dept. of Corrections, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calif. Dept. of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rudas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?