Altamirano et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Plaintiff: Marlon Altamirano, Derrico Aubrey, Myrick Banks, Paul Blevins, Antone Brodis, Derick Brown, Larry Caballero, Clifford Chaney, Jose Chavez, Ebert Consuegra, Barry Cook, Elmor Deleon, Roy Doss, Dennis Dunham, Gonzalo Escoto, Jerome Felder, Joseph Ferris, Andra Foster, Stephen Franklin, Ruben Gaeta, Aubrey Galloway, Manuel Gamboa, Justin Garrett, Luis Guzman, Sinohe Hercules, Victor Herrera, Curtis Jackson, Mandaz Johnson, Edward Jones, Albert Lee, Mikhiel Leinweber, Cleofas Lewis, Michael Madeira, Robert Maeshack, Daniel Masushige, Enrico Mellon, Lich Nguyen, James Ortega, Mack Page, Tyejahn Parker, Marvin Pierce, Carlos Quintanilla, Earl Randle, Jay Roach, David Robinson, Antonio Robles, Anthony Rodriguez, Johnny Sanchez, Tyrone Sanders, Adrian Sepulveda, Charles Singleton, Manuel Tejeda, Michael Wells, Carter Williams, Finley Wimbley and Richard Woodard
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Jeffrey Beard, Paul Brazelton, Matthew Cate, Scott Frauenheim, James Hartley, Susan L. Hubbard, Deborah Hysen, Felix Igbinosa, Scott Kernan, Chris Meyer, Tanya Rothchild, Teresa Schwartz, Dwight Winslow, Carl Wofford, James A. Yates and J. Clark Kelso
Case Number: 1:2015cv00607
Filed: April 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2019. (Timken, A)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Vacating July 31, 2019 Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/29/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re Stipulation to Continue Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/20/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Staying Actions pursuant to the Stipulatlion of the Parties, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/18/16. CASE STAYED. (Verduzco, M)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Re Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants J. Clark Kelso and Robert Sillen 33 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/1/16: This Court DISMISSES the complaint without prejudice against Defendants J. Clark Kelso and Robert Sillen ONLY. (Hellings, J)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. It is hereby ordered that the time for defendants to file a responsive pleading in this matter is extended to March 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/11/2016. (Hernandez, M)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to Either File an Executed Notice of Service of Summons or Serve the Complaint within 20 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2015. (Hernandez, M)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion to Amend the Complaint; and Entering Stipulation for Sillen Amendment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Converting Scheduling Conference to Status Conference and Continuing from 9/29/2015 to 10/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/16/2015. (Kusamura, W)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant J. Clark Kelso 16 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/13/15: This court DISMISSES the complaint without prejudice against Defendant J. Clark Kelso only. (Hellings, J)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Scheduling Conference from 8/10/2015 to 9/29/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2015. (Hernandez, M)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Stipulation for Order and extending time by which Defendant J. Clark Kelso must respond to complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/17/2015. (Rosales, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altamirano et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Altamirano
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrico Aubrey
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrick Banks
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Blevins
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antone Brodis
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Brown
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Caballero
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Chaney
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Chavez
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebert Consuegra
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Cook
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmor Deleon
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Doss
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Dunham
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Escoto
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Felder
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ferris
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andra Foster
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Franklin
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Gaeta
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aubrey Galloway
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Gamboa
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Garrett
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Guzman
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinohe Hercules
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Herrera
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Jackson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandaz Johnson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jones
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Lee
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhiel Leinweber
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleofas Lewis
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Madeira
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maeshack
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Masushige
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrico Mellon
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lich Nguyen
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ortega
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Page
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyejahn Parker
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Pierce
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Quintanilla
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Randle
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Roach
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Robinson
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Robles
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rodriguez
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Sanchez
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Sanders
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Sepulveda
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Singleton
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Tejeda
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wells
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Williams
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finley Wimbley
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Woodard
Represented By: Edward Burns
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Victoria Elizabeth Niewrzol
Represented By: Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Represented By: Frederik Pablo Spiess
Represented By: Gregg David Zucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan L. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Hysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Rothchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Clark Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?