Ronald Young v. Sisodia et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Young
Defendant: C. Sisodia and J. Kim
Case Number: 1:2015cv00640
Filed: April 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That This Case be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/27/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel 74 , 76 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2018: Motions are DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REQUEST for the Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison to Provide Information Regarding Assistance Available to Plaintiff; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send a Copy of this Order to Senior Assistant Attorney General Monica Anderson, the Warden of Salinas Valley State Prison, and the Litigation Coordinator at Salinas Valley State Prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/24/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Following Discovery and Status Conference; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of Scheduling Order 67 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/10/2018. (Hellings, J)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 46 , 66 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/19/2017: 1. The findings and recommendations issued by the magistrate judge on November 17, 2017, are ADOPTED in full; and 2. The Motion is DENIED as moot. (Hellings, J)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 46 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction be Denied as MOOT; Objections, if any, Due within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 55 Motion for Recusal of Chief Judge O'Neill and Motions for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 09/28/2017. (Flores, E)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel and Motion to Stay Proceedings, and Granting Plaintiff's Request for Complete Court Docket Sheet signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/27/2017. (Flores, E)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER After Initial Scheduling Conference; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of Order Requiring Initial Disclosures and Setting an Initial Scheduling Conference re 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/20/17. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/13/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Gonzalez, R)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order 1.) Complete Court Docket Sheet; 2.) Two Court Hearing Minute Orders; and 3.) Two Court Hearing Transcripts, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/31/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 40 MOTION to STAY all proceedings pending appellate review signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Reconsideration by District Judge signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default and Motion for Default Judgment 33 , 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/24/17. (Hellings, J)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISCHARGING 25 Order to Show Cause; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to Send Plaintiff a Copy of the Docket Sheet, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/3/17. (Marrujo, C)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Adopting 20 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Denying Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; ORDER For this Action to Proceed Only Against Defendant C. Sisodia for Deliberate Indifference to a Serious Medical Need in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and Dismissing All Other Claims and Defendants, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/8/16. J. Kim (Medical Doctor at CSP-Corcoran) Terminated. Case Referred Back to Magistrate Judge. (Gonzalez, R)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCREENING ORDER; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Action Proceed Against Defendant C. Sisodia for Deliberate Indifference to a Serious Medical Need in Violation of the Eighth Amendment, and that all Other Claims and Defendants be Dismissed with Prejudice, re 19 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/7/16. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/21/2016 vacating 15 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting leave to file Second Amended Complaint and directing Clerk to file lodged 17 Second Amended Complaint. (Lundstrom, T)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Case Be Dismissed, With Prejudice, for Plaintiff's Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/14/16: Objections Due Within Thirty Days. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Young v. Sisodia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Sisodia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?