Hobbs Container Company, Inc. v. Sorma USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hobbs Container Company, Inc.
Defendant: Sorma USA, Inc., Andrea Mercadini and Diego Tapparelli
Case Number: 1:2015cv00643
Filed: April 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/16/2016 ORDERING 8 That case No. 1:15-CV-643 LJO GSA is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. 14 (Reader, L)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, ORDER Directing The Clerk Of The Court To Close This Case, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/9/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Errata and Correction to Document 7 Filed Herein; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/2015. (Martinez, A)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Tolling Agreement Between the Parties; and ORDER Thereon signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/24/2015. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs Container Company, Inc. v. Sorma USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hobbs Container Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kenton J. Klassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Mercadini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego Tapparelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?