Williford v. Scrivner
Plaintiff: Richard Williford
Defendant: Zach Scrivner
Case Number: 1:2015cv00653
Filed: April 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Granting Defendant's 43 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/30/2015. Referred to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING the Hearing Date of August 28, 2015; ORDER GRANTING 27 Defendant's Motion to DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and Directing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/17/2015. (Hall, S)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/14/2015. (Hall, S)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Peremptory Challenge Which the Court Construes as a Motion for Judicial Disqualification, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/13/2015. (Hall, S)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STRIKING 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/10/2015. (Hall, S)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/6/2015. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2015. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Hall, S)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASES, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/10/2015. Related Case No. 1:15-cv-00868---JLT. (Hall, S)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-0892 KJM-CKD PS) to Fresno (1:15-cv-0653 GSA PS) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/15. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williford v. Scrivner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Williford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Scrivner
Represented By: Mark Lloyd Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?