Hackett v. Fisher et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Hackett
Defendant: Raymond Fisher, P. Virk, T. Neal, N. Malakkla, M. Conanan and I. Singh
Case Number: 1:2015cv00670
Filed: May 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding 52 Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, with Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/10/18. Case Closed(Martin-Gill, S)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Directing Parties to Meet and Confer and Directing Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Abandon All Claims 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/4/2018: Defendant's Response Due September 14, 2018. (Hellings, J)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 36 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/13/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants 43 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/12/2018: This action proceeds solely on plaintiff's Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim against defendant Toor regarding conduct in May-June 2016. (Hellings, J)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's eighth amendment claim against Defendants Stolfus and Sisodia is Dismissed; Plaintiff's eighth amendment claim against Defendant Toor for Delaying the knee procedures for two years is dismissed; Plaintiff's custom practice claim is dismissed as to all defendants re 14 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Stephen Hackett ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/22/18. Objections to F&R due by 2/8/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Defendant's ex parte application for extension of time to file reply to Plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment 40 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/2/2018. Reply due by 1/5/2018.(Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 36 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/27/17. 30-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to Recaption Case; ORDER Directing Defendant Toor to File Responsive Pleading, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Adopting 28 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 22 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/8/17. C. Sisodia (Physician's Assistant) terminated. Matter Referred Back to Magistrate Judge. (Gonzalez, R)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 22 MOTION to DISMISS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Stolfus for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/20/16: Defendant Stolfus is DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Stolfus Should Not Be Dismissed From this Action for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/10/16. Show Cause Response Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee in Full within Forty-Five Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/06/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackett v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Virk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Malakkla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Conanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?