Mission Linen Supply v. City of Visalia
Plaintiff: Mission Linen Supply
Defendant: City of Visalia
Case Number: 1:2015cv00672
Filed: May 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 FURTHER ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/02/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Mission's remainder of Mission's motion to enforce judgment (Doc. No. 184 ) is GRANTED. The City shall pay Mission 50% of the $32,812.57 feasibility study fee. The City shall pay Mission as soon as possible but no later than 30 days from service of this order. (Gonzales, V)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT AND ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING, (Doc. No. 184 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/12/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's motion to enforce judgment is DENIED with res pect to third requested supplemental order regarding payments relating to the pilot study and other costs. Within twenty-one days from service of this order, the parties shall submit additional briefing, as described. Within fourteen days from servi ce of the supplemental briefing, the parties shall file replies. Once the Court has received the additional briefing, it will either set a hearing date (if the Court determines that would be helpful) or issue a further order that resolves the two outstanding aspects of Plaintiff's motion to enforce judgment. (Gonzales, V)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 FINDINGS of FACT and CONCLUSIONS of LAW. Mission's motions to strike (Doc. Nos. 153, 160, and 162) are DENIED. The City's motion to strike (Doc. No. 151) is GRANTED in part and the testimony of Peter Krasnoff's with respect to co st of repairing the City's sewers and with respect to the City of Fresno's sewer maintenance program is STRICKEN. The City's requests to take judicial notice (Doc. Nos. 139 and 150-1) are DENIED. Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 9613 (g)(2), the Court declares as follows: a. For all necessary future response costs incurred by Mission regarding the PCE Plume, Mission is responsible for 50% of those future costs and the City is responsible for 50% of those future costs; and b. The City is responsible for 100% of any repairs to the Subject Sewers that may be necessary. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/5/2019. (Timken, A)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Status Conference currently set for 6/11/2018 to 7/2/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/1/2018. (Kusamura, W)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 128 MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/17/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re: STIPULATED REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL REGARDG CERTAIN CAUSES OF ACTION ONLY, FROM MISSION LINEN'S COMPLAINT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/4/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE PURSUANT TO DOCUMENT 91 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/20/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE FROM OCTOBER 3, 2017 TO OCTOBER 11, 2017 AND WAIVING A JURY, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Regarding SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (set before Judge McAuliffe on September 13, 2017 at 9:30a.m.), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/29/2017. (Herman, H)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION and ORDER Setting a Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/28/2017. (The Parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement to Magistrate Judge McAuliffe on or before September 6, 2017.) (Kusamura, W)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CORRECT TYPOGRAPHICAL ERRORS IN THE UNDISPUTED FACTS SECTION OF THE AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/15/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing the Jury Trial currently set for 5/23/2017 to 10/3/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, and VACATING the Motions in Limine hearing set for 5/8/2017 and converting that to a Telephonic Status Conference at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/25/2017. (Kusamura, W)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CORRECTING NUNC PRO TUNC THE DATES FOR SUBMISSION OF VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS AND AGREED SUMMARY OF THE CASE, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT CONFERENCES, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/17/2017. (Kusamura, W)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request modifying deadlines and hearings as follows: Defendant shall supplement expert disclosures based on the new documents received as discussed at the informal discovery dispute hearing no later th an 8/11/2016; Rebuttal expert discovery deadline is 8/30/2016; Expert discovery cutoff is extended to October 5, 2016; Dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 12/5/2016; Pre-trial conference will be held on 3/22/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; and the Jury Trial is set for 5/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/16/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the following extension of deadlines: Defendant's Supplemental Expert Disclosures due by 8/11/2106; Rebuttal Expert Discovery deadline is 8/26/2016; Expert Discovery due by 10/5/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/5/2016; Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; and the Jury Trial set for 5/22/2017 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/9/2016. (Rooney, M)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/20/2016. (Kusamura, W)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT 28 signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/18/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Dismissing with Prejudice Certain Affirmative Defenses, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/15/16. (Verduzco, M)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Stipulation and third joint request for extension of time regarding close of non expert discovery and expert discovery and Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/12/2016. (Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: 6/15/2016; Expert Disclosure due by 7/27/2016; Expert Discovery due by 9/12/2016) (Rosales, O)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SHORTENING Time for Hearing Regarding the Motion to Compel the City's Deposition (Doc 384). (1) The motion to compel the City of Visalias Rule 30(b)(6) deposition filed on April 15, 2016 shall be set for hearing on April 27, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (2) The noticed hearing date of May 6, 2016 is vacated. (3) The Parties Coppola, Laster, Mission Linen and the City of Visalia shall file a joint discovery dispute statement no later than April 20, 2016. MOTION to COMPEL the City of Visalia' ;s Deposition: Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. NOTE: this hearing is also set in 1:11-cv-01257-AWI-BAM Coppola, etal. v. Paragon Cleaners, etal. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2016. (Herman, H)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulation and Second joint request for extension of time regarding close of non expert discovery and expert discovery and Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/12/2016. (Initial Expert Disclosure due by 7/6/2016; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 8/16/2016; Expert Discovery due by 8/29/2016) (Rosales, O)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines: Non-Expert Discovery deadline extended to 4/15/2016; Initial Expert Disclosure extended to 6/2/2016; Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure extended to 6/16/2016; and Discovery and Expert Discovery deadline is extended to 7/29/2016. All other dates and orders outlined in the Scheduling Order issued on 8/13/2015, document 11 , remain in full force and effect. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/9/2016. (Rooney, M)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and Joint Request for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/6/2015. (Martinez, A)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Stipulation and Joint Request for Continuance of Date for City of Visalia to Respond to the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/29/2015. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission Linen Supply v. City of Visalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mission Linen Supply
Represented By: Lori J. Gualco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Visalia
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?