McMillan v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Glenn McMillan
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Harvest Power, Inc. and Gro-Well Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00695
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/13/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/30/2017. (Thorp, J)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/09/2016. (Thorp, J)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Stipulated Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. 85 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/29/2016. (Timken, A)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting Defendant Gro-Well's 70 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/13/2016. (Defendant Gro-Well's motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief is granted without further leave to amend.) (Gaumnitz, R)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING defendant Gro-Well Brands, Inc.'s ex parte application requesting additional time, up and to, 6/14/2016, to file a responsive pleading to the amended complaint. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/27/2016. (Rooney, M)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/03/16 ORDERING that 30 Gro-Well's Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's claim for injunctive relief is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and DENIES Gro-Well's Motion in all other respects. An amended complaint shall be filed within 14 days. (Benson, A)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/19/2016 DENYING Lowe's 23 Motion to Dismiss. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn McMillan
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Phillip J. Eskenazi
Represented By: Neil K. Gilman, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvest Power, Inc.
Represented By: Roger L Longtin, PHV
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Represented By: Raj N. Shah, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gro-Well Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?