King v. Calistro
Plaintiff: Alton King
Defendant: Calistro
Case Number: 1:2015cv00698
Filed: May 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Close Action Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Resetting Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing Date signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/04/2018. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 4/20/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Alton King, CDCR# T-83180 on April 12, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #25, United States Courthouse, 501 I Street, Sacramento, CA 95814, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/12/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 4/12/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Setting Telephonic Trial Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/09/2018. Telephonic Scheduling Hearing set for 1/16/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Flores, E)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Adopting 53 Findings and Recommendations, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Calistro's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/30/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Calistro's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's 37 Objections and DENYING Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 12, 2017, Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order 30 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/17: Dispositive Motion Deadline is 4/10/2017. (Hellings, J)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/19/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 15 Motion for Addition of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation as Defendant in this Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/15. (Verduzco, M)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Directing Clerk of Court to File Second Amended Complaint, Lodged on September 21, 2015 10 , 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/15. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Calistro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alton King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calistro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?