Washington v. Rough et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Washington
Defendant: P. Rough, C. Sisodia and N. Holland
Case Number: 1:2015cv00725
Filed: May 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 52 Notice to District Court for Requested Portions of Transcripts and Exhibits to be Delivered to the Ninth Circuit Clerk's Office in Support of Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/24/2018. (Flores, E)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 35 , be Granted and Judgment be entered In Favor of Defendants re 35 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ;referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/6/18. Objections to F&R due by 8/24/2018(Martin-Gill, S)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 35 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/6/18. 30-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second 33 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding Defendants' 27 Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery; ORDER Regarding Defendants' 30 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/14/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2017.(Flores, E)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Defendants' Second Motion for an Extension of Time to Serve Responses to Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/28/2017. Responses due by 5/8/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte 18 Motion for Pretrial Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/28/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Rough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Rough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Sisodia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?