Porreca et al v. Flowers Baking Co. of California, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Porreca, Bread Raxx, Inc., David Aguero, Aguero, Inc., Christian Angulo, Chris Angulo Inc., Gereme Barrett, Donald Bodan, Jr., Pompeii Distribution Inc., Christian Cabico, C.I. Cabico, Inc., Dennis F. Ceklovsky, II, DFC Distributing Company, Inc., Arturo Gonzalez, Gonzalez and Son Inc., Carlos Gonzalez, CCGE, Inc., Eric Guyton, Tim Jacobus, Scott Medeiros, SM Distributing, Inc., Khang Nguyen, David Padia, Thee Bakery Corp., Nazal Parvin, Parvin, Inc., Nicholas Sanchez, Sanchez Distributing, Inc., Kevin Sena, K. Sena Distribution, Inc., Woon Tam and T&J Distribution, Inc.
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of California, LLC and Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00732
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents by 8/13/2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2018. (Jessen, A)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Dispositional Documents by August 13, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/13/2018. (Jessen, A)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER; Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, Trial set for 1/8/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/10/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER RE FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/13/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ADDENDUM TO SCHEDULING ORDER 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/27/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION and ORDER Continuing the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/4/2016 to 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/26/2016. (Seng, Michael)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: CONFIDENTAL INFORMATION, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Requiring Plaintiff's Personal Appearance; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Serve this Order on Plaintiff, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/24/16. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/5/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Verduzco, M)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Requiring Mellen Law Firm to Provide Clarification, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/21/2016. (Within two (2) days of this order, plaintiffs' counsel is directed to file with the court a clarification indicating whether the Mellen Law Firms intends to remain or to seekwithdrawal as counsel of record for Gonzalez and Son, Inc. If withdrawal is sought, the clarification must set out the grounds for withdrawal.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to Amend Complaint, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/2016. (1. Plaintiffs shall file their first amended complaint within five (5) days of this order; and 2. Defendant shall respond within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the first amended complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying as Moot 22 Motion to Dismiss Action as to Defendant Safeway, Inc., or Alternatively to Dismiss the Sixth and Eighth Causes of Action, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/1/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/15/15 re: 38 ORDERING that the submission date for the joint status report is CONTINUED to 9/17/15. (Meuleman, A)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/10/15 ORDERING that the parties' time to submit a Joint Status Report pursuant to the Court's 6/11/15 Order is EXTENDED to 9/15/2015. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porreca et al v. Flowers Baking Co. of California, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of California, LLC
Represented By: A. Craig Cleland, PHV
Represented By: Carolyn B. Hall
Represented By: Margaret Santen Hanrahan, PHV
Represented By: Kevin P Hishta, PHV
Represented By: Robert Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: William F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Porreca
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bread Raxx, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aguero
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aguero, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Angulo
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Angulo Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gereme Barrett
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Bodan, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pompeii Distribution Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Cabico
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.I. Cabico, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis F. Ceklovsky, II
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DFC Distributing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Gonzalez
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalez and Son Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gonzalez
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCGE, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Guyton
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Jacobus
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Medeiros
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khang Nguyen
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Padia
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thee Bakery Corp.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazal Parvin
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parvin, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Sanchez
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanchez Distributing, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sena
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Sena Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woon Tam
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&J Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?