Gardiner Family, LLC, et al. v. Crimson Resource Management Corp
Plaintiff: Gardiner Family, LLC and Rosedale Farming Group, LLC
Defendant: Crimson Resource Management Corp
Case Number: 1:2015cv00751
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Directing the Clerk to Close the Action Based Upon the Parties' Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/12/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Kilpatrick, Terry)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AFTER #58 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 12/1/2017. All other pending dates are VACATED. (Hall, S)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Kilpatrick, Terry)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING #56 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/22/2017; Hearing by 10/20/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/30/2017; Hearing by 12/19/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 2/12/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC for Amendment of Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kilpatrick, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kilpatrick, Terry)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Crimson Resource Management Corp.(Barfield, Theresa)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Theresa C Barfield on behalf of Crimson Resource Management Corp. Attorney Barfield, Theresa C added. (Barfield, Theresa)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #52 Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/10/2017. Expert discovery completed by 7/14/2017. Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 7/28/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/18/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/12/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 2/6/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC for Order Amending the Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order, #2 Declaration Dr. Eweis in Support, #3 Declaration Terry Kilpatrick in Support, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kilpatrick, Terry)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rosedale Farming Group, LLC, Gardiner Family, LLC.(Oliver, Patricia)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER #49 for Filing Amended Complaint to Correct Misnomer, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/21/2016. First Amended Complaint to be filed within five court days. (Hall, S)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Filing Amended Complaint to Correct Misnomer by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Blatt, Gayle)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: MID-DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2016; status of discovery addressed. Plaintiffs Counsel Patricia Oliver and Julie Fieber (telephonic) present. Defendants Counsel Richard Deitchman (telephonic) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/FTR- Hall. (Hall, S)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Fieber, Julie)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julie Lynn Fieber on behalf of Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Fieber, Julie)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julie Lynn Fieber on behalf of Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. Attorney Fieber, Julie Lynn added. (Fieber, Julie)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Pitre, Frank)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE VIA COURTCALL by Crimson Resource Management Corp. (Deitchman, Richard)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name [to Parris Law] by All Plaintiffs. (Oliver, Patricia)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AFTER INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order #35 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/4/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline: 6/1/2016. (Hall, S)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order held in chambers and off the record on 4/1/2016. Court to issue Order. Plaintiffs Counsel T. Kilpatrick present. Defendants Counsel R. Deitchman present. (Hall, S)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/1/2016: An INFORMAL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE re: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order (Doc. #35 ) is SET for 4/1/2016 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The moving party is DIRECTED to initiate a one-line conference call with counsel and, when all parties are on the line, call the Court at 661-326-6620. (Hall, S)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC re #35 MOTION Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order, #36 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kilpatrick Reply Decl in Support of Ex Parte)(Kilpatrick, Terry)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 DECLARATION of Richard S. Deitchman re #36 Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Deitchman, Richard)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPPOSITION by Defendant Crimson Resource Management Corp to #35 MOTION Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order. (Deitchman, Richard)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION Ex Parte Application to Amend the Scheduling Order by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kilpatrick Declaration in Support of Ex Parte)(Kilpatrick, Terry)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as Modified by the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/2016. (Hall, S)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order Governing Confidential Information by Gardiner Family, LLC. Attorney Pollock, Stewart Ryan added. (Pollock, Stewart)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF CRIMSON RESOURCE MANAGEMENT CORP. REGARDING WELL ABANDONMENT (WELL 74X-16) by Crimson Resource Management Corp. (Deitchman, Richard)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/2015, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE HEARING filed by ECRO Otilia Rosales, Phone number 559-499-5928 E-mail orosales@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 12/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2016. (Rosales, O)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of Judge Dale A. Drozd to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Lawrence J. O Neill* to District Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings. (Gonzalez, R)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Crimson Resource Management Corp. (Deitchman, Richard)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Oliver, Patricia)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Crimson Resource Management Corp for proceedings held on November 19, 2015 before Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Court Reporter ECRO Otilia Rosales. (Goldsberry, Francis)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC for proceedings held on November 19, 2015 before Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Court Reporter ECRO Otilia Rosales. (Oliver, Patricia)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/19/2015. Consent/Decline Deadline 11/30/2015. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/1/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 2/22/2017; Expert 5/22/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/2/2017; Hearing by 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/21/2017; Hearing by 9/12/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury/Bench Trial set for 1/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/19/2015. Case SCHEDULED. Court to issue Order. Plaintiffs Counsel Patricia Oliver and Gayle Blatt (telephonic) present. Defendants Counsel Richard Deitchman present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO/FTR (Hall). (Hall, S)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Blatt, Gayle)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gayle Meryl Blatt on behalf of Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. Attorney Blatt, Gayle Meryl added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Blatt, Gayle)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Patricia K. Oliver on behalf of Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. (Oliver, Patricia)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Crimson Resource Management Corp.(Deitchman, Richard)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Denying Defendant's #6 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/2015. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REQUEST for Court Call by Gardiner Family, LLC. (Martin, George)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF CRIMSON RESOURCE MANAGEMENT CORP. REGARDING WELL ABANDONMENT by Crimson Resource Management Corp. (Deitchman, Richard)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Designation of Counsel for Service by All Plaintiffs. (Pitre, Frank)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (Text Entry Only), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/24/2015: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 08:30 AM is CONTINUED to 11/19/2015 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Telephonic appearances via CourtCall are authorized. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Terry Kilpatrick on behalf of Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC. Attorney Kilpatrick, Terry added. (Kilpatrick, Terry)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/2015: The hearing on the pending motion to dismiss #6 , currently set for August 11, 2015, is VACATED and the matter is submitted for decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule. 230(g). (Arellano, S.)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Crimson Resource Management Corp in re #11 Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Deitchman, Richard)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY by Crimson Resource Management Corp re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Deitchman, Richard)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Gardiner Family, LLC, Rosedale Farming Group, LLC to #6 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Oliver, Patricia)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Francis M Goldsberry, II on behalf of Crimson Resource Management Corp. Attorney Goldsberry, Francis M added. (Goldsberry, Francis)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATEMENT of Crimson Resource Management Corp.'s Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Defendant Crimson Resource Management Corp re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION , #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Deitchman, Richard)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Crimson Resource Management Corp in SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION . (Deitchman, Richard)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by Crimson Resource Management Corp. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Deitchman, Richard)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Crimson Resource Management Corp. Attorney Deitchman, Richard Sterling added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Deitchman, Richard)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Oliver, Patricia)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Crimson Resource Management Corp* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patricia K. Oliver* *R. Rex Parris Law Firm* *43364 10th Street West* *Lancaster, CA 93534*. (Lundstrom, T)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Def Crimson Resource Management Corp. filed by All Plaintiffs against All Plaintiffs by Rosedale Farming Group, LLC, Gardiner Family, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-5895614) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardiner Family, LLC, et al. v. Crimson Resource Management Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gardiner Family, LLC
Represented By: Frank Mario Pitre
Represented By: George F Martin
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Represented By: Ara Ray Jabagchourian
Represented By: Ethan Thomas Litney
Represented By: Julie Lynn Fieber
Represented By: Patricia K. Oliver
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Represented By: Stewart Ryan Pollock
Represented By: Terry Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosedale Farming Group, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Represented By: Ara Ray Jabagchourian
Represented By: Ethan Thomas Litney
Represented By: Frank Mario Pitre
Represented By: George F Martin
Represented By: Julie Lynn Fieber
Represented By: Patricia K. Oliver
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Represented By: Terry Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crimson Resource Management Corp
Represented By: Francis M Goldsberry, II
Represented By: Richard Sterling Deitchman
Represented By: Theresa C Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?