(PC) Solano v. Tate et al
Plaintiff: Librado Solano, Jr.
Defendant: Harold Tate and Allan J. Yin
Case Number: 1:2015cv00756
Filed: May 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #55 Judgment, #54 Order Dismissing Case served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
August 28, 2018 Filing 55 JUDGMENT dated *08/28/2018* in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff pursuant to order. (Flores, E)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice due to Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with Court Orders signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/27/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 27, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 53 Trial Confirmation minutes served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Thorp, J)
August 27, 2018 Filing 53 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: TRIAL CONFIRMATION HEARING held on 8/27/2018; order to follow. Plaintiff Librado Solano Pro Se NOT PRESENT. Defendants Counsel Janine Jeffery present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J)
August 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #52 Order, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DIRECTING Parties to Appear at Trial Confirmation Hearing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/22/2018.( Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #51 Order to Show Cause, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Court's Second Scheduling Order,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/08/18. Show Cause Response due 10-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
May 9, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #50 Order served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/08/2018. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) Jury Trial set for 10/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 281)(Flores, E)
April 30, 2018 Filing 49 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Harold Tate. (Jeffery, Janine)
April 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #48 Order, served on Librado Solano Jr. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Defendant Consent Form, Defendant's Consent or Decline Due Within Twenty Days, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Gonzalez, R)
March 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #47 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Librado Solano Jr. (Gonzalez, R)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Adopting #42 Findings and Recommendations, Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #31 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/5/18. (Gonzalez, R)
January 8, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #46 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Findings and Recommendations (Order) served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING #45 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DISMISSING Certain Claims for Failure to State a Claim, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/7/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 30, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #45 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
November 30, 2017 Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 12/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 28, 2017 Filing 44 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #42 by Defendant Harold Tate. (Jeffery, Janine)
September 27, 2017 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #42 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
September 26, 2017 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Inactive: #42 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) sent to Librado Solano, Jr. (Flores, E)
September 18, 2017 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #42 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
September 15, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 418 Brian Street, Santa Maria, CA 93454 by Librado Solano, Jr. (Flores, E)
September 1, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #42 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
September 1, 2017 Filing 42 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' #31 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/1/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2017 Filing 41 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Deposition Transcript of Librado Solano as outlined in Document #40 . (Hellings, J)
August 16, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Lodging by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin. (Jeffery, Janine)
August 15, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #39 Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Submit a Hard Copy of Plaintiff's Entire Deposition Transcript, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 14, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: 38 Docket Annotation served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
August 14, 2017 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is 1:15-cv-00756-DAD-SAB (PC). (Marrujo, C)
July 31, 2017 Filing 37 REPLY by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin re #31 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Pl's Decl re Dr. Tate's Declaration, #2 Objections to Pl's Decl re Dr. Yin's Declaratoin)(Jeffery, Janine)
July 24, 2017 Filing 36 OPPOSITION to #31 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Librado Solano, Jr. (Flores, E)
June 27, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #35 Order on Motion for Extension, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Second #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/27/17. Filing Deadline: 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
June 23, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Opposition to Motion to Summary Judgment by Librado Solano, Jr. (Flores, E)
May 9, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #33 Order on Motion for Extension served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/17. 45-Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for 120-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Librado Solano, Jr. (Jessen, A)
April 13, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Dr. Feinberg, #4 Declaration of LVN Kimberly Hutto, #5 Declaration of Janine K. Jeffery, #6 Declaration of Dr. Harold Tate, #7 Declaration of Dr. Allan Yin, #8 Proposed Order)(Jeffery, Janine)
March 1, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Defendants' #29 Motion to Extend the Time to File a Dispositive Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2017. (Flores, E)
February 28, 2017 Filing 29 MOTION for Modification of Scheduling Order by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Janine K. Jeffery, #3 Proposed Order)(Jeffery, Janine)
February 21, 2017 SERVICE BY MAIL: #28 Substitution of Attorney Order served on Librado Solano Jr. (Jessen, A)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2017. Added attorney Janine K. Jeffery for Harold Tate and Allan J. Yin. Attorney James C. Phillips terminated. (Jessen, A)
February 21, 2017 Filing 27 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Allan J. Yin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeffery, Janine)
February 21, 2017 Filing 26 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Harold Tate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeffery, Janine)
August 9, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #25 Order served on Librado Solano Jr. (Jessen, A)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order, and Extending the Discovery Deadline to September 16, 2016, and Dispositive Motion Deadline to December 16, 2016, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
August 5, 2016 Filing 24 REQUEST for Modification of Scheduling Order by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin re #15 Discovery and Scheduling Order. (Phillips, James)
July 29, 2016 Filing 23 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Jennifer Marquez terminated (Phillips, James)
June 16, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #22 Order on Motion for Extension served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #21 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline as Unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
May 26, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME for Discovery by Librado Solano, Jr. (Sant Agata, S)
March 28, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Order on Motion for Extension served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Verduzco, M)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Defendants' #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/28/16. (Verduzco, M)
March 25, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin. (Marquez, Jennifer)
January 19, 2016 SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order on Motion for Extension served on Librado Solano Jr. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/2016. (Jessen, A)
January 15, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION of Discovery Deadline by Librado Solano, Jr. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to CSP Sacramento, P.O. Box 290066, Represa, CA 95671 by Librado Solano, Jr. (Jessen, A)
December 7, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Discovery and Scheduling Order served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Expedited Trial Notice) (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2015 Filing 14 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Harold Tate Waiver sent on 9/4/2015, answer due 11/3/2015; Allan J. Yin Waiver sent on 9/4/2015, answer due 11/3/2015. (Flores, E)
November 3, 2015 Filing 13 ANSWER TO PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin. Attorney Marquez, Jennifer added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marquez, Jennifer)
November 3, 2015 Filing 12 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Allan J. Yin Waiver sent on 11/3/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marquez, Jennifer)
November 3, 2015 Filing 11 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Harold Tate Waiver sent on 11/3/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marquez, Jennifer)
August 19, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Directing Service by USM served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * complaint * filed on * 5/18/2015,* on * Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin*, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/2015. Service Deadline set for 12/21/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
August 17, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 2 Summons, 2 USM-285 Forms, and 3 copies of the complaint, by Librado Solano, Jr. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Service Documents Order, served on Librado Solano Jr.. (Marrujo, C)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims, AUTHORIZING Service of Complaint on Defendants Drs. Tate and Yin, and Forwarding Plaintiff the Necessary Service of Process Documents for Completion and Return to the Court Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2015. Service is appropriate for Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin. Clerk to send plaintiff: 2 Summons, 2 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the #1 Complaint filed on 5/18/15. Case Management Deadline: 8/31/2015. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions and Summons) (Marrujo, C)
July 27, 2015 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Screening Order, NOTIFYING The Court of Willingess to Proceed on Congnizable Claims by Librado Solano, Jr. (Marrujo, C)
July 8, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Screening Order, served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Either File Amended Complaint or Notify Court of Willingness to Proceed only on Cognizable Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/08/2015. Amended Complaint due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Flores, E)
June 26, 2015 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Librado Solano, Jr. (Hellings, J)
May 22, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
May 20, 2015 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Librado Solano Jr. (Flores, E)
May 20, 2015 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/22/2015. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
May 18, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Librado Solano, Jr. (Flores, E)
May 18, 2015 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Harold Tate, Allan J. Yin by Librado Solano, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Solano v. Tate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Librado Solano, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Tate
Represented By: Jennifer Marquez
Represented By: James C. Phillips
Represented By: Janine K. Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan J. Yin
Represented By: Jennifer Marquez
Represented By: James C. Phillips
Represented By: Janine K. Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?