Coronado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rosalinda Coronado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv00806
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS UNDER THE EQUALACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/12/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal be Granted in Part. Objections due within 14 days. The matter is referred to Judge Ishii. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF. Defendants stipulation for a second extension of time to file an opposition to Plaintiffs opening brief is GRANTED IN PART; Defendant shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before September 16, 2016; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before October 3, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2016. (Hernandez, M)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant shall file an opposition to Plaintiff's opening brief on or before 9/14/2016; Plaintiff's reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 9/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SUBSTITUTING Plaintiff and Extending Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/4/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that plaintiff shall file her opening brief on or before May 5, 2016. All other deadlines in the scheduling order shall be modified accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/18/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2016. (Kusamura, W)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/1/15. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coronado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalinda Coronado
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?