Caetano v. Peery
Petitioner: Nathan Caetano
Respondent: S. Peery
Case Number: 1:2015cv00832
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 75 , 76 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Notice of Appeal signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/1/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DENYING 78 Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/22/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying as moot Motion for Expedited Review 57 and granting Motion for Ruling 68 . FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO: (1) Grant Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 45 ; (2) Dismiss the Petition as Time-Barred; (3) Deny Petitioner's Mot ions for Appointment of Counsel 49 , 50 , 51 , 54 ; (4) Deny Petitioner's Motions for Appointment of Experts 50 , 53 ; (5) Deny Petitioner's Motion for Transcripts 51 ; (6) Deny Petitioner's Motion for Default Judgment 62 ; and (7) Deny Petitioner's Motions for Evidentiary Hearing 66 , 69 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/29/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R's due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/10/2017 requiring Respondent to file a response to petition within 60-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION; DENYING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING 40 MOTION REQUESTING RULING; DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, 35 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL AND DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, 36 , 37 , 38 MOTIONS FOR DISCOVERY signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Respondent's Motion to Dismiss; ORDER GRANTING 27 , 28 , 30 Petitioner's Motion for Ruling on Motion to Dismiss; ORDER DENYING 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel Without Prejudice; AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 20 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss be DENIED re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/25/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 20 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/29/2015. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 3 , 9 Motions to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/2/2015. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caetano v. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan Caetano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?