Ceasar v. Aguirre
Plaintiff: Walter D. Ceasar
Defendant: E. Aguirre
Case Number: 1:2015cv00873
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Order Defendants to Pay, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/17/18. (Gonzalez, R)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/14/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE and ORDER That Plaintiff Walter D. Caesar is No Longer Needed as Witness in These Proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/10/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Walter D. Ceasar, CDCR #F-27672 on Thursday, 8/10/2017 at 10:30 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/8/17. (Hellings, J)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ADOPTING 27 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses be Granted in Part and Denied in Part signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/23/2017. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 36 Motion to Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/8/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 22 Motion to Strike be Granted in Part and Denied in Part signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/23/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/10/2017.(Flores, E)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Discovery Orders; ORDER EXTENDING Deadline to Serve Initial Disclosures to April 6, 2017; and ORDER Directing Clerk to Re-Send Plaintiff a Copy of ECF Numbers 19-21 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/6/2017. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceasar v. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter D. Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Aguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?