Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Zena Mae Anderson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv00906
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER Settling Attorney's Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. §2412(d) and Costs: that fees and expenses in the total amount of THREE THOUSAND DOLLARS ($3,000.00), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. §2412, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/29/2017. (Herman, H)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Reversing Agency's Denial of Benefits and Ordering Remand signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/01/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time: that Defendant shall have a second extension of time, up to and including February 22, 2016, in which to file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief. All other deadlines set forth in the Courts Case Management Order are modified accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/22/2016. (Herman, H)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER for Defendant to Serve the Certified Administrative Record: that Defendant shall have an extension of time, up to and including December 3, 2015, to serve and file the Certified Administrative Record. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 6) are modified accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/3/2015. (Herman, H)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/17/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob Mikow, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zena Mae Anderson
Represented By: John Vincent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?