Roach v. Tate Publishing & Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terri Haynes Roach
Defendant: Tate Publishing & Enterprises, LLC, Tate Music Group and Richard Tate
Case Number: 1:2015cv00917
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Vacating September 14, 2017 Scheduling Conference and Requiring Plaintiff to File a Motion for Default Judgment Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/17. (Hellings, J)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADDRESSING STATUS REPORT. As the stay of this action has been lifted, Plaintiff is no longer required to file status reports. In the current status report, Plaintiff indicates that she is working on a motion for default judgment. The Court not es that, although this action was brought against Defendant Tate Music Group, the request for entry of default did not address Defendant Tate Music Group. Plaintiff is advised that she will be required to address Defendant Tate Music Group prior to entry of judgment in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO EITHER SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE OR FILE A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO SEPTEMBER 14, 2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Within ten ( 10) days from the date of service of this order, Plaintiff shall file a written response to the Court, showing cause why this action should not be dismissed for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute or a motion for entry of default. The scheduling conferen ce currently set for June 20, 2017, is continued to September 14, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the conference date. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order shall result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Thorp, J)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and DIRECTING Clerk of the Court to TERMINATE Michael J. F. Smith, John L. Migliazzo, and Michael J. F. Smith, APC, as Attorneys for Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/19/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Sant Agata, S)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS COUNSEL TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OR A STATUS REPORT - DEADLINE APRIL 17, 2017 AT 5:00 P.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Requiring Defendants' Appearance at March 22, 2017 Hearing and Directing Defendants' Counsel to File an Affidavit Supplementing the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (ECF No. 45 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/2017. (Valdez, E)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - The parties shall file their respective motions on or before February 22, 2017; Oppositions to the motion shall be filed on or before March 8, 2017; A reply, if any, shall be filed on or before March 15, 2017; Oral argument on any motion filed shall be heard on March 22, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9. If no motions are filed, the Court shall convert the March 22, 2017 hearing to a status conference and the parties shall file a joint status report seven days prior to the scheduled date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue Status Conference from 1/9/2017 to 1/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR JANUARY 9, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2016. (Hernandez, M)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED ORDER Re Status Report 32 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/16: Status Report due 12/15/2016, and every ninety days thereafter until the stay in this action is lifted. (Hellings, J)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE STATUS REPORT. The parties shall file the next status report no later then December 1, 2016, and every ninety days thereafter until the stay in this action is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/6/2016. (Hernandez, M)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re STATUS REPORT, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/2016. (Kusamura, W)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Directing Parties to File Status Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/2016. (Status Report to be filed within 5 days of entry of this order.) (Hernandez, M)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order requiring parties to file status reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2016. The parties shall continue to file a status report every ninety days until the stay in this action is lifted. (Rosales, O)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER to VACATE THE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for October 27, 2015 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2015. (Hernandez, M)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 7 DEFENDANT'S Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue; GRANTING 8 DEFENDANT'S Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/2015. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. Tate Publishing & Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Publishing & Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Music Group
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Tate
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Haynes Roach
Represented By: Samer Salhab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?