Gentile v. U.S. Federal Marshal
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Gentile
Defendant: U.S. Federal Marshal
Case Number: 1:2015cv00943
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this case be Dismissed as frivolous and fot failure to state a claim; the Clerk of the Court be Directed to Close this case re 24 Amended Complaint filed by Raymond A. Gentile ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/24/18. Objections to F&R due by 5/18/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for Plaintiff to Submit Information Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/11/2017. cc: Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (Jessen, A)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as Frivolous and for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to file a third amended complaint or a notice of voluntary dismissal by 6/2/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena; ORDER Directing Personal Service of Subpoenas Duces Tecum by United States Marshals Service without Prepayment of Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/24/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING Counsel to Inform Court of Status of Representation Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/24/16. (Marrujo, C)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPOINTING Counsel for Limited Purpose of Filing Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/19/16. Attorney Milton Greg Mullanax for Plaintiff Raymond A. Gentile Added. (Marrujo, C)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Application to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/25/15. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentile v. U.S. Federal Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond A. Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Federal Marshal
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?