Block v. Starbucks Corporation, et al.

Plaintiff: Hendrik Block
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Mathews and Associates-2, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00991
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/10/2018 GRANTING 74 Motion for Attorney Fees the terms detailed in this order. The court awards plaintiff $77,034.50 in attorneys' fees, and $8,963.50 in costs and litigation expenses, for a total award of $85,998.00. (Washington, S)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/31/18, ORDERING that the parties have 14 days from the date of this order to submit a request to seal documents, pursuant to the Local Rules, explaining why the current briefing on plaintiffs motion for attorney fees (ECF Nos. 74 , 78 , 79 ) should remain partially sealed. (Kastilahn, A)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/19/18 ORDERING that the Settlement Agreement between the parties, submitted by Block, is to be FILED UNDER SEAL in its entirety; Plaintiffs unredacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of his Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Litigation Expenses is be FILED UNDER SEAL in its entirety. Plaintiff shall publicly file the redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of his Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Litigation Expenses as provided to the Court in his Request. (Benson, A.)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/8/2018 ORDERING This matter is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. The undersigned shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for the purpose of adjudicating Plaintiff Hendrik Block's motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and litigation expenses, if any. Plaintiff Hendrik Block shall have 45 days after the entry of this Order within which to file his Fees Motion. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/3/2017. New case number is 1:15-cv-00991-DAD-CKD. (Lundstrom, T)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Continuing Deadline for Settlement Conference and Vacating Pre-Trial and Trial Dates, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/6/2017. (The court:1. Extends the deadline for the holding of a settlement conference to September 5, 2017 and dir ects the parties to coordinate a mutually agreeable date for that settlement conference before a magistrate judge in the Sacramento Division of this court; and 2. Vacates the previously scheduled pre-trial conference and trial dates in this action with those dates being re-scheduled if necessary following the settlement conference.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Continuing Expert Discovery (Doc. 40 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/9/2017. (The 38 amended scheduling order is hereby modified to reflect that all expert discovery shall now be completed no later than 4/7/2017.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER to Modify Schueduling Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/22/2016. (The court's 11/2/2015 17 pretrial scheduling order is hereby modified and the deadlines and hearing/trial dates are reset as follows: Exp ert Discovery Deadline: 1/31/2017; Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: 6/20/2017; Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 8/28/2017, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial CONTINUED to 10/24/2017, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.) (Gaumnitz, R)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/5/2016. (Rosales, O)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Mathews and Associates-2, LLC only signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/31/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint Pursuant to the Parties' 22 Stipulation, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/2016. (1. Plaintiff shall file his first amended complaint within five (5) days of this order; and 2. Defendants shall respond within fourteen (14) days of the filing of the first amended complaint.)(Gaumnitz, R)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation, document 7 , requesting an extension of time to 8/6/2015 for defendants to file a responsive pleading. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/31/2015. (Rooney, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block v. Starbucks Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hendrik Block
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Shalend Shane Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathews and Associates-2, LLC
Represented By: Shalend Shane Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?