Cornejo et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frank Cornejo and Dora Cornejo
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, U.S. Bancorp and Western Progressive, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00993
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING 143 Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Lawsuit, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/10/2017. (Hall, S)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/30/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING 139 Stipulation to Continue Date on Which to File a Joint Further Scheduling Report to August 7, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/21/2017. (Hall, S)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING 137 Stipulation to Continue Date on Which to File a Further Joint Scheduling Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2017. Joint report due by 6/23/2017. (Hall, S)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING 135 Stipulation to Continue the Filing Date for the Further Scheduling Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/14/2017. Joint report due by 5/19/2017. (Hall, S)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING 132 Stipulation to Continue Date on Which to File Joint Further Scheduling Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/9/2017. Joint report due by 4/14/2017. (Hall, S)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Requiring Counsel to File a Joint Further Scheduling Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/7/2017. (Hall, S)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and GRANTING Defendant's Motion for a New Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/2/2017. (Hall, S)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING 115 Stipulation to Reset the Hearing Date on Motion to Amend the Judgment and Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/21/2016. Hearing on Motions 108 110 RESET for 2/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 109 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Application for Attorney Fees and Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2016. Any motion for attorney fees and costs SHALL be filed no later than 28 days after the Court issues its order on post-trial motions; enforcement of the judgment is STAYED until 28 days after the Court issues its order on post-trial motions. (Hall, S)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 58(b), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/15/2016. (Hall, S)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING Defendant's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/28/2016. (Hall, S)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPROVING 75 Stipulation to Dismiss: (1) Claim for Violation of Cal. Civ. Code § 2924.10; and (2) Claim for Violation of Cal. Civ. Code § 2923.6 as Against Western Progressive Trustee, LLC, dba Western Progressive LLC, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/19/2016. (Hall, S)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE: COURTROOM/TRIAL DECORUM, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/13/2016. (Hall, S)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 Stipulation to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/19/2016. Trial Documents due by 10/7/2016. Exhibit binders due by 4:00 PM on 10/14/2016. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 10/ 17/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. No further continuances will be granted; the parties will notify the Court of a settlement by 10/10/2016 or will proceed to trial on 10/17/2016. (Hall, S)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 48 Defendant's Motion in Limine, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/15/2016. (Hall, S)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/29/2016. Motions in Limine: Filed by 9/2/2016; Opposition by 9/9/2016; Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Trial Submissions due by 9/16/2016. Exhibit binders due by 9/23/2016. (Hall, S)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/16/2016. (Hall, S)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 22 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/28/2016. Non-Expert and Expert discovery completed by 6/13/2016. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/20/2016; Hearing by 7/18/2016. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/15/2016; Hearing by 8/12/2016. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 8/29/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 11 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/18/2015. (Hall, S)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2015. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/29/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 11/10/2015; Non-Expert 5/2/2016; Expert 5/2/2016. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/22/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 5/9/2016; Hearing by 6/6/2016. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/10/2016; Hearing by 7/8/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornejo et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cornejo
Represented By: Giandominic Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Cornejo
Represented By: Giandominic Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Represented By: Brian Andrew Paino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?