Hutchinson v. BVCSD, et al.

Plaintiff: Laura Hutchinson
Defendant: Bear Valley Community Services District and David Edmonds
Case Number: 1:2015cv01047
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Referring Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING THE CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2018. CASE STAYED. Joint status report due within 120 days. (Hall, S)
May 7, 2018 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/7/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 6/29/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
October 30, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING fourth stipulation to amend the case schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/27/2017. (Non expert Discovery due by 3/2/2018, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/16/2018; Expert Discovery due by 4/ 6/2018; Non-Dispositive and Dispositive Motions filed by 4/6/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Jury Trial set for 6/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston ) Absolutely no further amendments to the case schedule will be entertained. (Rosales, O)
September 15, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 52 Third Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/15/2017. Discovery deadlines: Non-expert by 10/13/2017; Expert by 11/17/2017. Non-Dispositive Motions and Dispositive Motions: Filed by 10/27/2017; Hearing by 11/27/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 12/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 24, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 49 Second Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/24/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 5/1/2017; Expert 7/14/2017; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 7/28/2017; Hearing by 8/25/ 2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/8/2017; Hearing by 10/6/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 11/20/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 1/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Settlement Conference remains set for 6/30/2017. (Hall, S)
February 21, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 47 Stipulation to Amend the Case Schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2017. Expert discovery completed by 5/5/2017. (Hall, S)
August 19, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 40 Motion to File a Fourth Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/19/2016. (Kusamura, W)
June 13, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/12/2016. Plaintiff's first cause of action is DISMISSED without leave to amend. (Hall, S)
April 26, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/26/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 7/29/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 3/31/2017; Expert 4/21/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 08:30 AM in B akersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 4/28/2017; Hearing by 5/26/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/12/2017; Hearing by 7/10/2017. Settlement Conf erence set for 6/30/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS), Fresno, before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
March 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/15/2016. (Hall, S)
December 22, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2015. (Hall, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. BVCSD, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hutchinson
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Valley Community Services District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?