Mock v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Plaintiff: Maurice C Mock
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Pleasant Valley State Prison, John Keith and Jeffrey A. Beard
Case Number: 1:2015cv01104
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER re: Stipulation Request for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/18. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER to Dismiss Defendant John Keith, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION and ORDER TO SET NEW DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE; Good cause appearing, the parties Stipulation to Set New Dispositive Motion Hearing Date is accepted and adopted by the Court. Hearing on any and all dispositive motions will be he ld December 15, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 6, Fresno. It is further ordered that a telephonic conference to discuss other scheduling issues will be held at 3:30 PM, Tuesday, November 7, 2017. Counsel for the parties shall participate by calling 888.204.5984 and entering access code 4446176 at least 10 minutes before the scheduled start of the conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/30/2017. (Bernacchi, M)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/17/2017. (Timken, A)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION and ORDER to SCHEDULE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 11/30/2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall submit their confidential settlement conference statements by no later than 11/21/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/15/2017. (Timken, A)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and ORDER to CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Settlement Conference currently scheduled for June 15, 2017, is hereby VACATED. All deadlines for filing and service of settlement conference statements in connection with the J une 15, 2017, conference only are VACATED. Counsel for all parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and notify the court of a new Settlement Conference date by no later than August 15, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/9/2017. (Timken, A)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION and ORDER TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER and set a TELEPHONIC Status Conference for 5/25/2017 at 10:30 AM in Yosemite (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. Parties Counsel are to appear by telephone by dialing 888.204.5984 and entering access code 4446176# at 10:25 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/18/2017. (Lafata, M)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/2017. (Timken, A)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Settlement Conference. The settlement conference scheduled for April 11, 2017, is VACATED, as are all deadlines for filing and service of settlement conference statements in connection with said conference. The parties shall meet and confer about addressing scheduling issues that may be impacted by Defendants' conflict of interest. If needed, the parties will seek a status conference with Magistrate Judge Seng to discuss amendments to the Scheduling Order that may be necessitated by the conflict. The parties shall submit new proposed settlement conference dates on or before April 28, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/31/2017. (Timken, A)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/21/2017. (Timken, A)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/7/2017. (Lafata, M)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Settlement Conference currently set for 12/15/2016, is CONTINUED to 4/11/2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/06/2016. (Thorp, J)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/17/2016. (Timken, A)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Stipulation Re: Defendants' Enlargement of Time To File An Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/19/2016. (Yu, L)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (ECF No. 23 ) Answer Due Within Twenty-One (21) days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/12/2016. (Yu, L)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Stipulation To Continue The Mandatory Scheduling Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference is now set for January 21, 2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/13/2015. (Yu, L)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting In Part Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (ECF NO. 4 ), Amended Complaint Due Within Fourteen (14) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/22/2015. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mock v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice C Mock
Represented By: Richard Crowley Conway
Represented By: Robert B. Zumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Catherine Elena Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley State Prison
Represented By: Catherine Elena Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Beard
Represented By: Catherine Elena Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?