Trifu v. Apker
Petitioner: Doru Gabriel Trifu
Respondent: Craig Apker
Case Number: 1:2015cv01114
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING as MOOT Habeas Petition 1 ; DECLINING to Adopt as MOOT Findings and Recommendations 20 ; and DENYING as MOOT Motion for Injunctive Relief 14 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/30/17: The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. (Hellings, J)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: REQUEST FOR RESPONDENT TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/7/2017. (Filing Deadline: 7/17/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/21/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/10/2017. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trifu v. Apker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doru Gabriel Trifu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig Apker
Represented By: Heidi Adams
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Michael S Frye, GOVT
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?