Tucker v. Paramo

Petitioner: Gerald L. Tucker
Respondent: Daniel Paramo
Case Number: 1:2015cv01164
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 23 Second Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/14/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 19, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 21 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Dismissal of his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/19/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 30, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating November 17, 2015 Findings and Recommendation 14 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding 15 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/15. Referred to Judge Ishii; 14-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
November 17, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/15: 14-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion To Recuse (ECF No. 9 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/30/2015. (Fahrney, E)
September 14, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Petitioner's Motion To Recuse (ECF No. 9 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2015. (Fahrney, E)
August 20, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Dismissed as Successive signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/19/2015. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 9/8/2015. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gerald L. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Daniel Paramo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?