Cavanaugh v. American National Property and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: William G. Cavanaugh
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company, Aerospace Insurance Managers, Inc. and Aerospace Insurance Services
Case Number: 1:2015cv01177
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/4/19 GRANTING 53 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/31/17 ORDERING that that the cut-off for depositions of expert witnesses is EXTENDED until 30 days after the Court rules on the dispositive motions filed in this matter. All other dates set forth in the Pretrial Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (Benson, A.)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER to amend Pretrial Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery cut-off for Depositions of William and Patricia Cavanaugh signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/4/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 04/26/17 ORDERING that Gary R. Farrar, as Chapter 7 Trustee, is SUBSTITUTED as Plaintiff in the place of William G. Cavanaugh; American National Property and Casualty Company may file an amended plea ding within 20 days; parties shall submit a stipulation proposing a revised date re Non-Expert Cut-Off as applicable solely to the depositions of William Cavanaugh and Patricia Cavanaugh within 7 days; the request that Mr. Mannion be permitted to redepose Bill Coulter by 05/12/17 is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER TO AMEND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/27/16. Non Expert Discovery Cut-off: 3/31/2017, Expert Disclosure: 5/19/2017. Supplemental experts are to be disclosed within 20 days after this date. All other dates in the Scheduling Order remain the same. (Kastilahn, A)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER TO JOIN CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE GARY R. FARRAR AS PLAINTIFF signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/4/15. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/25/2015 ORDERING that the 10 Motion to Dismiss presently scheduled for 10/22/2015 is CONTINUED to 11/19/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 with Opposition and Reply dates being calculated by the new Motion date. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavanaugh v. American National Property and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerospace Insurance Managers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerospace Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Cavanaugh
Represented By: E. Gerard Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?