Gonzalez v. The Fresno Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez Gonzalez
Defendant: The Fresno Sheriff's Department and Fresno County Jail
Case Number: 1:2015cv01200
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 80 ORDER DISMISSING Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to Obey Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to TERMINATE Pending Motions and CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/6/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 79 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute; Show Cause Response due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/5/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 78 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File Notice Clarifying his intent,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/18. (21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order 75 ORDER VACATING September 7, 2018 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and ORDER re Plaintiff's Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/2018. Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 73 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for a Trial Date 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/22/2018. (Hellings, J)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 66 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Parties' Motions Regarding Discovery 57 , 61 , 62 , 63 , 64 ; ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and STAYING CASE for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/5/2018. (Hellings, J)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 60 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 52 ; ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Scott From This Legal Matter 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/26/2018: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Scott on the docket; and This action will proceed against the remaining defendants. (Hellings, J)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 55 ORDER DENYING 53 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/11/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 52 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Scott should not be Dismissed from this Action for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service; Show Cause Response due within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/9/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2018 regarding 47 Declaration. (Lundstrom, T)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 40 ORDER DENYING Motion to Compel Without Prejudice 38 ; ORDER Clarifying Discovery Request and ORDERING Defendant to Respond Within Fourteen (14)Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/5/17: Deadline to Identify Doe Defendants: Forty-Five (45) Days. (Hellings, J)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension of Time; ORDER DENYING 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and ORDER DENYING 33 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/13/2017. Within sixty (60) days, Plaintiff shall provide the Court with written notice identifying Doe Defendants with enough information to locate the defendants for service of process. (Jessen, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER Finding Certain Claims Cognizable and Dismissing Remaining Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/11/17. Mims added. Fresno County Jail terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration and extending deadline to file Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/27/2016. Third Amended Complaint due by 1/31/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER Denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to File Partial Amendment, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/13/15. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. The Fresno Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hernandez Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fresno Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?