Vaughn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Perry Howard Vaughn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01247
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Stipulation and Order for award of attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/5/2017. (Rosales, O)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 9/12/2016 for receipt of plaintiff's reply brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/29/2016. (Rooney, M)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 8/12/2016 for receipt of defendant's responsive brief, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/11/2016. (Rooney, M)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING an extension of time to 6/13/2016 for receipt of plaintiff's opening brief, with all other deadlines extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/27/2016. (Rooney, M)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of time to 2/24/2016 for plaintiff to serve his confidential letter brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 2/12/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Howard Vaughn
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lara A. Bradt, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?