Velasquez v. Sherman
Petitioner: Ricardo Velasquez
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 1:2015cv01288
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Requiring Parties to File a Further Joint Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 07/14/2021. Filing Due by 11/15/2021. Status Conference set for 11/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Maldonado, C)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File Joint Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/5/2021. (Filing Deadline: 120-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File Joint Report signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/10/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File Joint Report, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/07/2020. (Filing Deadline: 60-Day) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER APPOINTING Attorney Marc Days for Ricardo Velasquez, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP on Appeal 45 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/14/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/17: 21-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's 13 Motion to LIFT STAY; ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2016. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Petitioner's Motion to Stay Proceedings 3 ; ORDER for Petitioner to File Regular Status Reports, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/15. CASE STAYED. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ricardo Velasquez
Represented By: Clifford Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?