Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC et al v. Couch
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC and Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Defendant: David Couch
Case Number: 1:2015cv01291
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CLOSING CASE re 59 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/7/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AFTER 57 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/19/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 3/3/2017. Request to withdraw the 53 Motion for Rule 11 sanctions is GRANTED. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Doc. 42) AND MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 43) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 14, 2016. (Munoz, I)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Lift Stay on this case, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/21/2016.( Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2016) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER GRANTING defendant's ex parte application to stay the case. The Court GRANTS defendant's ex parte application to stay this case until the Ninth Circuit resolves his appeal of the PI Order7, document 31 , and VACATES the Court's 10/23/2015 order on the motion to dismiss, document 29 . Order signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/17/2015. (Rooney, M)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER re: Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/22/2015. (Kusamura, W)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Re Plaintiffs' 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/24/2015. (The Court GRANTS MSSB's motion for a preliminary injunction of Couch's FINRA arbitration proceedings. Couch is RESTRAINED AND ENJOINED from pursuing his claims against MSSB in FINRA arbitration until the Court resolves this case.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST PROCEEDING IN FINRA ARBITRATION signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 9, 2015. (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC et al v. Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Blake Robert Bertagna
Represented By: Betsey A. Boutelle
Represented By: Mary Catherine Dollarhide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Represented By: Blake Robert Bertagna
Represented By: Betsey A. Boutelle
Represented By: Mary Catherine Dollarhide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Couch
Represented By: Patricia K. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?