Estrada v. Macias et al
Plaintiff: David Estrada
Defendant: Teresa Macias, Susan Flores, L. D. Zamora and Jeffrey Wang
Case Number: 1:2015cv01292
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER that Inmate David Estrada, CDCR # T-42165 is no longer needed as a participant in these proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting Defendants' second motion to modify the amended discovery and scheduling order 139 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/25/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM at California State Prison Corcoran before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Jessen, A)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 134 Motion in Limine signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's First 114 Motion to Compel, Filed August 2, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 130 Request for Extension of Time to oppose Plaintiff's fourth through eleventh Motions to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/2017. Filing Deadline: 10/12/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order and granting Defendants' Motion to extend time to file oppose Plaintiff's First, Second, and Third Motions to Compel 117 , 126 , 128 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/1/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING 105 , 107 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/2017. Amended Complaint due by 8/11/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ADOPTING 87 Findings and Recommendations, and DENYING Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 98 Motion for issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/9/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/30/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER VACATING PROTECTIVE ORDER AND STAY OF MERITS-BASED DISCOVERY, DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL AS PREMATURE, AND ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER RE 56 , 58 , 65 , 76 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/2017. Amended Pleadings Deadline: 6/23/2017; Discovery Deadline: 8/25/2017; Dispositive Motions Deadline: 10/27/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS WHITFORD, VICKJORD AND FLORES TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL RE 56 , 58 , 76 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/3/2017. (Response Filing Deadline: 4/24/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Adopting in Part 74 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, DISMISSING all Defendants, Except Defendants Garnett, Whitford, Vikjord, and Flores, without Prejudice, DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendants in Contempt, and GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits F, G, and V, to Opposition signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying 77 Motion for issuance of new discovery schedule as premature and unnecessary signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/3/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HOLD DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT FOR VIOLATING A COURT ORDER, AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL OPPOSITION AND EXHIBITS RE: 26 , 55 , 56 , 58 , 61 , 67 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 3/16/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 53 Motion for Protective Order, Staying Merits-Based Discovery Until After Resolution of Pending Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Stay Ruling on Defendants' Exhaustion Motio n, GRANTING Defendants' Request to Extend Time to Respond to Plainitff's Motions to Compel, and GRANTING Plaintiff Thirty Days to File an Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 63 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/13/16. (Marrujo, C)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery as Moot 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/16. (Hellings, J)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Second 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/1/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 50 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline for Filing an Exhaustion Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/29/2016. Motion Deadline: 8/19/2016. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Physical and Mental Examination, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibits A, B and C, Lodged by the Court on May 2, 2016, and Directing Clerk of Court to File Exhibits Under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2016. (Jessen, A)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Joinder signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/5/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND AS UNNECESSARY; DENYING MOTION TO SEAL AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO RETURN AMENDED COMPLAINT LODGED ON OCTOBER 5, 2015, TO PLAINTIFF re 9 , 10 , 11 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/19/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Macias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?