Provencio v. Lizzarraga

Petitioner: Alfredo Provencio
Respondent: Joe Lizzarraga
Case Number: 1:2015cv01327
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1 ) be DENIED signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/31/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 27, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 14, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING Respondent to Lodge Additional State Court Records, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/13/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
March 11, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/10/16. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provencio v. Lizzarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alfredo Provencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe Lizzarraga
Represented By: Lewis Albert Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?