David A. Estrada v. Macias et al
Plaintiff: David A. Estrada
Defendant: Teresa Macias, Olga Beregovskaya, Conall McCabe, Jeffrey Wang, Michael Grajeda, J. Lewis, L.D. Zamora, S. Macilvaine, R. Duque and John Amaya
Case Number: 1:2015cv01335
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/06/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that Inmate David Estrada, CDCR#T-42165 is no Longer Needed as a Participant in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport David A. Estrada, CDCR #T-42165 for a Settlement Conference on November 17, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. at CSP-Corcoran signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on November 17, 2017 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/25/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Rule 16 Discovery ORDER Following Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/22/17. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David A. Estrada v. Macias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Macias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Beregovskaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conall McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grajeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Macilvaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Duque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?