Villery v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Defendant: Jay Jones, Richard Schmidt, Phillip Rhodes, Lawrence Emard, Christopher Yerton, Rafael Escarcega, David Nelson and Norman Karlow
Case Number: 1:2015cv01360
Filed: September 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Scheduling a Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's 57 Motion to Compel and Related Discovery Issues, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/14/2019. ( Telephonic Discovery Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson) (Copy of this order forwarded to Litigation Coordinator at VSP)(Martin-Gill, S)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion and GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule, re 58 & 62 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 7/18/19. (Marrujo, C)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jared M. Villery on January 22, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/3/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Jared M. Villery, CDC #V-88097, on January 22, 2019 at 10:30 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/21/2018. (Flores, E)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING Parties' Joint Request to Continue Settlement Conference,signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/4/18. (Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/24/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificancum to transport inmate, Jared M. Villery for a settlement conference scheduled before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/18/2018 at 10:00 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 9/19/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/2/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDERED that Plaintiff shall proceed in this action on his First Amendment Claims against Defendants Jones, Schmidt, Yerton, Escarcega and Nelson, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/10/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS (1) for Plaintiff to Proceed on Cognizable First Amendment Retaliation Claims against Defendants Jones, Schmidt, Yerton, Escarcega, and Nelson, and (2) to Dismiss all other Claims and Defendants with Prejudice; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/13/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part 10 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/16/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villery v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Emard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Yerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Escarcega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Karlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?