McCoy v. Tate et al
Plaintiff: Davon Elimu McCoy
Defendant: Harold Tate, R. Lenker, J. Hill, K. Twitty, S. Holland, E. Coontz, J. Lundy, T. Jackson, S. Reed, R. De Luna and S. Shiesha
Case Number: 1:2015cv01428
Filed: September 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/10/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Transport Plaintiff Davon E. McCoy, CDC# H-67575, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/11/2017. (Marrujo, C)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER (1) CONVERTING Findings and Recommendations to Order; (2) DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; (3) GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; and (4) SETTING Evidentiary Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for 7/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) 20 , 27 , 32 , 33 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/29/17. (Hellings, J)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Defendants' ExParte 19 Motion for Extension of Time; Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant in Part Defendants' 20 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrat e Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/27/17. 14-Day Objection Deadline. Referred to Judge Ishii. Case is Assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. The New Case Number is 1:15-cv-01428-AWI-MJS. (Gonzalez, R)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-1956 EFB) to Fresno (1:15-cv-1428 MJS) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/21/15. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Tate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davon Elimu McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Lenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Twitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Coontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. De Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Shiesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?