U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Sensient Dehydrated Flavors Company, et al.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Sensient Dehydrated Flavors Company, Sensient Dehydrated Flavors, LLC and Sensient Natural Ingredients, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01431
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER APPROVING 65 Consent Decree, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/29/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Sensient Natural Ingredients to Produce Responsive Documents and Information to EEOC's Request for Production No. 68 and Interrogatory No. 1 (Doc. 44). (1.) The EEOCs motion to compel, filed on July 12, 2016, is DENIED; (2.) The EEOCs request for an extension of the deadline to identify any potential claimants is GRANTED; (3.) The deadline to identify all claimants in this action and notify Defendant in writing of said claiman ts is extended to November 30, 2016. The Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for October 11, 2016, is continued to December 14, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before the undersigned. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/17/2016. (Herman, H)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Preliminary Scheduling Order Deadline: (1.) All stipulated amendments or motions to amend the Complaint to name SNI as the sole corporate Defendant shall be filed by September 2, 2016. The August 5, 2016 deadline for amending or filing a stipulated amendment to the pleadings remains in effect for all other purposes. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/8/2016. (Herman, H)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Telephonic Status Conference: the Telephonic Status Conference is continued from 1/7/2016 to January 13, 2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/23/2015. (Herman, H)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER in re: Unopposed Ex Parte Motion (Doc. 6) to Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference: Initial Scheduling Conference is continued from December 10, 2015 to January 25, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall conduct their conference by or on December 21, 2015 and their joint scheduling report shall be due to the Court on January 15, 2016. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/29/2015. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Sensient Dehydrated Flavors Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensient Dehydrated Flavors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensient Dehydrated Flavors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensient Natural Ingredients, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?