Harris v. German et al
Plaintiff: Devonte B Harris
Defendant: Humberto German, Philip Holguin, Summer Cordova, L. Borgess, R. Womak, J. Martinez, J. Hubbard, W. Rasley, D. Menzie, D. Lovelady and D. Botello
Case Number: 1:2015cv01462
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER & Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/9/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/11/2020. (Settlement Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.) (Marrujo, C)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case for Failure to Obey Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/23/2020. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due within Fourteen (14) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING 93 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/9/2020. (Marrujo, C)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER requiring parties to notify court whether a settlement would be beneficial signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/5/2020. 30-Day Filing Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DENYING 86 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/4/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING 75 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/5/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 81 , 82 , Motions for Extension of Time; SIXTY-DAY (60) DEADLINE to File Motion to Compel and to Conduct Depositions, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/30/2020. (Orozco, A)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Discovery Sanctions Against Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/5/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 72 Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Discovery for Limited Purpose Discussed in This Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/15/2019. Discovery Deadline (for limited purpose): 12/18/2019. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/18/2020. (Jessen, A)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents 58 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/24/2019. Deadline to produce documents 10/25/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to respond to this order within 30-Days 62 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/9/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Reopening Discovery and Setting New Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/24/2019. ( Discovery due by 8/30/2019 and Dispositive Motions filed by 10/30/2019)(Martin-Gill, S)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ADOPTING 56 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 44 Motion for Summary Judgment ; This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, including issuance of a new scheduling order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/23/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re Defendants' 60 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel; ORDER WITHDRAWING Defendants' 38 MOTION to COMPEL, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/12/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw Admissions 49 ; vacating December 26, 2018 Scheduling Order 54 . FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' 44 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT be denied without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/2019. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd; Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Defendants' Motion to Compel and Motion for Summary Judgment; Sixty-Day Deadline For Plaintiff to File Response to Defen dants' Motion to Compel 38 ; Sixty-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Opposition or Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 44 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/18. New Discovery Deadline: 1/29/2019. New Dispositive Motions Deadline: 3/30/2019. (Gonzalez, R)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/15/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; ORDER RE-OPENING Discovery and Setting New Deadlines to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive Motions, for all Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/21/2018. New Discovery Deadline: 11/30/2018; New Dispositive Motions Deadline: 1/30/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Adopting 30 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims and Defendants Consistent with Magistrate Judge's Prior 23 Order In Light of Williams Decision, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/21/17. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Determining that Plaintiff's Complaint is not barred by statute of limitations; ORDER DISCHARGING Court's Order to Show Cause issued on February 24, 2017 15 ; the Court shall screen the First Amended Complaint in due course, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 05/08/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SECOND ORDER requiring further Response to 15 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/6/2017. (Filing Deadline: 4/24/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Requiring Further Response to Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/22/2017. 15-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed as barred by Statute of Limitations 8 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/24/2017. Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. German et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devonte B Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humberto German
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Holguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Borgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Womak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Rasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Menzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lovelady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Botello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?