Ontiveors v. St. Clair, et al.,
Plaintiff: Martin V. Ontiveors
Defendant: St Clair, Clegg, Ridge and Savage
Case Number: 1:2015cv01565
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 03/01/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Action Should not be Dismissed with Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/06/2017. (Flores, E)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Action Should not be Dismissed with Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 02/03/2017. Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2017.(Flores, E)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/30/16: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ontiveors v. St. Clair, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin V. Ontiveors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?