Willis v. Kandkhorova
Plaintiff: Averille Willis
Defendant: Nellya Kandkhorova
Case Number: 1:2015cv01572
Filed: October 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 37 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and the Clerk of Court be Directed to Close the Case re 9 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/24/2018. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; NOTICE and Warning of Requirements for Opposing Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/15/2018. 21-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER adopting 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing certain claims signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/2/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Non-Cognizable Claims; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/8/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER approving in part 27 Stipulation for Stay of Case signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/21/2017. (Case Management Deadline: 8/24/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER regarding Discovery Dispute Procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/10/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING 24 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Serve Discovery Responses signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/29/2016. Discovery Responses due by 12/29/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Kandkhorova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Averille Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nellya Kandkhorova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?