Sahibi v. Gonzales. et al.
Plaintiff: Oussama Sahibi
Defendant: Borjas Gonzales, Howard . Smith, Brandon Cope and Mario Lozano
Case Number: 1:2015cv01581
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING 157 Plaintiff's Request for Return of Witness Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/22/2019. (Jessen, A)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER TO RETURN WITNESS FEES TO PLAINTIFF signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/21/2018. (Jessen, A)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER AMENDING 147 April 15, 2018 Order re Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/2018. (Jessen, A)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING In Part Plaintiff's 140 Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/15/18. April 26, 2018 Deadline for Submission of Money Orders. (Marrujo, C)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER ADOPTING 132 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/4/2018. (Jessen, A)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss non-cognizable state law claims re 1 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/1/2017. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days.(Lundstrom, T)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER that Inmate Oussama Sahibi is no longer needed as a witness in these proceedings and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/16/2017. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2017 at Corcoran State Prison at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER adopting 120 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to grant in part and deny in part 92 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/18/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 92 Defendant Crounse's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and Summary Judgment be GRANTED in Favor of Defendant Crounse on Plaintiff's Claim for Compensatory Damages for Emotional Injuries re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 7/11/2017. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's 109 Motion for Unredacted Housing Roster, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/23/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/13/17. (Marrujo, C)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER modifying April 5, 2017 Protective Order re 102 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 90 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/19/2017. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/3/2017. (Jessen, A)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 83 Motion to Compel as to Defendant Crounse signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/6/2017. Motion denied without prejudice to Plaintiff filing an amended motion within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/2/2017 regarding 83 MOTION to COMPEL. 14-Day Filing Deadline for Defendants to submit documents to the Court for in camera review. (Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DEEMING Defendants' Motion to Compel WITHDRAWN 63 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/17. (Hellings, J)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING 78 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/10/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER adopting 64 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to deny 44 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING Telephonice Discovery Dispute Conference; Clerk to Send Copy of This Order to Litigation Coordinator at Salinas Valley State Prison, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/5/16. Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for 1/13/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng. (Marrujo, C)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 44 Defendant Crounse's Motion for Summary Judgment be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/7/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 60 Joint Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/1/2016. Discovery Cut-Off: 12/2/2016. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 48 Findings and Recommendations to Deny Defendants' 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; ORDER DENYING 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/24/2016. (Marrujo, C)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 45 Leave to File Surreply; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 31 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/19/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY WITHOUT PREJUDICE 38 AND GRANTING THE PARTIES' REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RESOND TO DISCOVERY 39 signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/15/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Crounse, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/1/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/27/16. (Verduzco, M)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of this Court's Expedited Trial Setting Procedures Upon Consent of All Parties signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/7/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Finding Cognizable Claims and Dismissing Remaining Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/8/2016. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahibi v. Gonzales. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oussama Sahibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borjas Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard . Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?