Parks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ethel Parks
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv01603
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses Under the Equal Access to Justice Act signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/16/2017. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DIRECTING Response signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REVERSING Agency's Denial of Benefits and ORDERING REMAND signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION Extension of Time; ORDER that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to August 12, 2016, in which to file Plaintiffs opening brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order shall be modified accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/9/2016. (Herman, H)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule: Based on the parties' stipulation (Doc. 14), and for good cause being shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff's stipulation for an extension of time shall be granted nunc pro tunc and Plaintiffs confidential letter brief, submitted June 30, 2016, shall be deemed timely. All other deadlines set forth in the October 26, 2015, Case Management Order are modified accordingly. (Doc. 6.) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/15/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Parks
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Scott J. Borrowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?