Smith v. Johal, et al.
Plaintiff: Jason Smith
Defendant: Johal, Klang, Youssef, Paik, Zepp, Brook Sheela, V Joseph, J. Lewis and J Katavich
Case Number: 1:2015cv01662
Filed: November 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Grant Defendant's 41 Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies; Fourteen-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/9/2018. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Sant Agata, S)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Protective Order and denying 45 Motion to ban California State Attorney General's Office from these proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/8/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER vacating 46 Order and granting Plaintiff's first Motion to extend time to file a response to Defendant's dispositive motion 44 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/9/2017. ( Response due by 12/19/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 21 Findings and Recommendation to dismiss action for failure to state a claim. Dismissal counts as a Strike pursuant to 28 USC 1915(g) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/19/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This Action be DISMISSED With Prejudice re 19 Second Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 10/31/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Johal, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brook Sheela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Katavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?