Price v. Commissioner of Social Security
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Petitioner: Bethany Kathleen Price
Case Number: 1:2015cv01676
Filed: November 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/23/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before 11/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before October 12, 2016; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before October 31, 2016.However, the parties are advised t hat due to the impact of social security cases on the Courts docket and the Courts desire to have cases decided in an expedient manner, requests for modification of the briefing scheduling will not routinely be granted and will only be granted upon a showing of good cause. Further, requests to modify the briefing schedule that are made on the eve of a deadline will be looked upon with disfavor and may be denied absent good cause for the delay in seeking an extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/13/2016. (Hernandez, M)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. Defendant shall file an opposition to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before September 12, 2016; Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before September 27, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/26/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bethany Kathleen Price
Represented By: James A. Yoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lynn M. Harada, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?