Cisneros v. Macomber
Petitioner: Alejandro Cisneros
Respondent: Jeff Macomber
Case Number: 1:2015cv01716
Filed: October 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING 25 Motion to Proceed, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/15/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Respondent's 18 Motion to Dismiss and to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/28/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 8/1/2016.(Flores, E)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-2183 EFB) to Fresno (1:15-cv-1716 EPG) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/12/15. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisneros v. Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alejandro Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?