April 26, 2024 |
Filing
119
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/26/2024. The Court sets a settlement conference on August 5, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Nguyen, J)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Filing
96
ORDER DISCHARGING June 2, 2022 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE 94 95 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/8/2022. (Hall, S)
|
June 2, 2022 |
Filing
94
ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS' INSURANCE CARRIER TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING WHY MONETARY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR FAILURE TO HAVE REPRESENTATIVE APPEAR AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO SEPTEMBER 21, 2022, TO BE HELD IN PERSON AT COURT; ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO CONTACT COURTROOM DEPUTY TO SCHEDULE INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS PRIOR TO CONTINUED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/01/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendants' insurance carrier, through Defendants' counsel or by special appearance, shall show cause in writing within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order why monetary sanctions should not issue for the failure to appea r at the June 1, 2022 settlement conference. The settlement conference is CONTINUED to September 21, 2022, at 10:30 a.m., to be held in person at the United States District Court in Bakersfield, 510 19th St, Bakersfield, CA 93301. The Court shall contact, through its Courtroom Deputy, the parties to arrange informal conferences to be held prior to the conference. Failure to comply with this order will result in the issuance of sanctions. (Gonzales, V)
|
April 21, 2022 |
Filing
91
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/2022. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Settlement Conference is continued to June 1, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. at the United States District Court in Bakersfield, 510 19th St, Bakersfield, CA 93301. (Gonzales, V)
|
February 18, 2022 |
Filing
87
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2022, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Settlement Conference currently set for 3/18/2022 is CONTINUED to 4/4/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroo m 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall submit their confidential settlement conference statementsdirectly to Judge Boone's chambers via email to SABOrders@caed.uscourts.gov no later than one week prior to the conference. (Apodaca, P)
|
November 17, 2021 |
Filing
80
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/17/2021. Settlement Conference set for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing
62
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/6/19 ORDERING that the initial disclosure of expert witnesses shall be served and filed on May17, 2019. Supplemental expert disclosure shall be due by June 6, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
|
April 8, 2019 |
Filing
59
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/5/2019 IT IS SO ORDERED That initial disclosure of expert witnesses shall be served and filed on 5/3/2019 and supplemental expert disclosure due by 5/23/2019.(Reader, L)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
55
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 3/13/19 ORDERING that the initial disclosure of expert witnesses shall be served and filed on 4/3/2019 and supplemental expert disclosure shall remain due 20 days from 3/21/2019, by 4/10/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/5/2018 ORDERING all discovery shall be completed by 1/28/2019; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/21/2019; The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be 4/18/2019. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 3, 2018 |
Filing
50
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/2/18: All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by Monday, October 29, 2018. All counsel are to designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert they propose to tender at trial not later than Thursday, December 17, 2018. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be Thursday, April 14, 2019. (Kaminski, H)
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
48
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/15/2018 CONTINUING dates as follows: All discovery shall be completed by 7/30/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2018; The last day to hear Dispositive Motions is 10/8/2018. (Zignago, K.)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing
46
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/27/2017 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, be completed by 3/26/2018; ORDERING that all counsel to designate experts by 5/17/2018; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 6/7/2018. (Hunt, G)
|
July 31, 2017 |
Filing
44
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/28/2017 ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, be completed by 1/15/2018; ORDERING all counsel to designate experts by 3/15/2018; ORDERING that dispositive motions be heard by 4/5/2018. (Michel, G.)
|
April 19, 2017 |
Filing
42
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/18/17 ORDERING All discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, shall be completed by Monday, 9/18/17. All counsel are to designate in writing, file with the Court, and serve upon all other parties the name, address, and area of expertise of each expert that they propose to tender at trial not later than Thursday, 11/16/17. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall be Monday, 10/2/17. (Becknal, R)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing
40
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/22/2017. (Hall, S)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
33
ORDER Changing Location of the Settlement Conference; ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/14/2016. Settlement conference set for 1/25/2017 at 09:30 AM at the United States Courthouse, 510 19th Street, Bakersfield. (Hall, S)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
30
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/31/2016 ORDERING Plaintiff shall be GRANTED a 14 day extension of time, up to and including 9/15/2016, to file any First Amended Complaint. (Reader, L)
|
August 12, 2016 |
Filing
26
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/12/2016 ORDERING 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; as conceded by Plaintiff, the Fourth Cause of Action, to the extent it includ es the County of Kern, fails to state a viable claim and the County is consequently DISMISSED from that cause of action; Moreover, all allegations against Defendant Youngblood are DENIED as insufficient on grounds that it cannot be determined from the Complaint whether Youngblood is being sued in his official or personal capacity; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is, however, DENIED as to the Third Cause of Action which suffices for pleadings purposes; Defendants' request to strike al l allegations in the First, Second and Third Causes of Action which purport to be based on the Eighth Amendment is GRANTED; all allegations pertaining to negligent or careless conduct, to the extent those allegations pertain to the First, Second or Third Causes of Action, are also STRICKEN; finally, the Second Cause of Action is STRICKEN in any event as redundant to the allegations already made in the First Cause of Action; Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint within 20 days following the date this Memorandum and Order is electronically filed, should he wish to do so. (Reader, L)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/2016 ORDERING 12 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike is CONTINUED to 2/11/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.(Reader, L)
|