United States Postal Service v. Jamke et al
Plaintiff: United States Postal Service
Defendant: Jamke, Stacey Carlson, Gabriel Ashlock, John A. Myrtakis, Ken David Elving and Invest West Properties
Case Number: 1:2015cv01806
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Denying Defendants 62 Motions for New Trial or in the Alternative, for Modification of Judgment and Instructions, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/1/17. (Gonzalez, R)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 02/03/2017. (Flores, E)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 35 43 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/11/2017. (Flores, E)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/1/2016. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Postal Service v. Jamke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Michael Anderson Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Carlson
Represented By: Walter John Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Myrtakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken David Elving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invest West Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?