Hernandez v. The GEO Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Hernandez
Defendant: The GEO Group, Inc. and GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01813
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/19/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AFTER 32 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/3/2017. Stipulated dismissal due by 4/3/2017. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISCHARGING 28 Order to Show Cause to Attorney Alis Moon, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/29/2016. (Hall, S)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER to ATTORNEY ALIS MOON to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Her Practicing in this Court Without First Seeking Membership, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/22/2016. Show Cause Response due by 12/29/2016. (Hall, S)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER 24 Allowing Defendants to Conduct a Defense Mental Examination of Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/19/2016. (Hall, S)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER 20 to Continue Trial and Discovery Dates, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/6/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 1/26/2017; Expert 3/6/2017. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 2/13/2017; Hearing by 3/13/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 3/13/2017; Hearing by 4/17/2017. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 5/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 7/24/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/24/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 4/14/2016. Initial Disclosures 2/26/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Non-Expert 10/31/2016; Expert 12/5/2016. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set f or 7/6/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/14/2016; Hearing by 12/12/2016. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/14/2016; Hearing by 12/29/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. The GEO Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Hernandez
Represented By: Alis M. Moon, NCAED
Represented By: Allyson K. Thompson, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The GEO Group, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Corrections and Detention, LLC
Represented By: Carlos Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?