Huerta v. Davis
Petitioner: Arturo Huerta
Respondent: Ron Davis
Case Number: 1:2015cv01827
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 31 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/6/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Deny Stay, Proceed With Exhausted Claims, and Deny Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING Respondent to File Brief and Lodge Documents Regarding Exhaustion of Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/17. (Marrujo, C)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huerta v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arturo Huerta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?