York v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Ray York
Defendant: M. Stewart, G. Garcia, J. Neighbors, C. Chen, R. Hutchinson, J. Lewis, C. Pfeiffer, N. Karlow and S. Rimbach
Case Number: 1:2015cv01828
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DISCHARGING Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum as to Inmate Reginald Ray York, CDCR # J-40227 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/08/2019. (Orozco, A)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 83 Request for Change of Venue signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/21/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Reginald Ray York, CDCR# J-40227 for Settlement Conference at Corcoran State Prison on November 8, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/8/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING 78 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 69 Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/24/19. (Gonzalez, R)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/23/19. Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 08:30 AM at Corcoran State Prison before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS re Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment re 64 , 69 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/27/19. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 76 Motion for a Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment and for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/13/2019. (Flores, E)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's February 28, 2019 Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/18/2019: 7-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER AMENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 61 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER GRANTING IN PART 53 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions; and ORDER DENYING 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/18/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Parties' Cross-Motions for Sanctions 53 , 57 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/27/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 59 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/18. Dispositive Motions deadline: 10/22/2018. (Marrujo, C)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/21/18. (Marrujo, C)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying Defendants' Second 49 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/15/18. (Gonzalez, R)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying Defendants' 50 Request for a Screening Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/18. (Gonzalez, R)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 35 Motion to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/26/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING Motion for Summary Judgment, GRANTING Motion to Strike, DENYING Motion for Sanctions, and REFERRING matter back to the Magistrate Judge 24 , 29 , 30 and 39 ; Defendant Stewart dismissed, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/21/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 31 Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/19/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 24 Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, Defendant's 29 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition and Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Sanctions signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 02/20/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/12/2018.(Flores, E)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 24 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/19/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING Certains Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/17. (Marrujo, C)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Objections to June 22, 2016 Order, and Denying Motion for Reconsideration 9 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/2/16. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Ray York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Karlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Rimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?