Dawson v. Commissioner of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Issac Da'bour Dawson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Jeffery Beard, Dave Davey, M. Jennings, R. Whitford, T. Marsh, J. Gonzales, J. Arnett, Johnson and A. Guzman
Case Number: 1:2015cv01867
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion as moot signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/22/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendants' Motion to Strike be Denied and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted 85 , 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/27/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Re Defendant's Notice 95 ; ORDER Directing Clerk to Correct the Court's Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/25/2018: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to correct the spelling of Defendant's name from Sheldon to "Shelton" on the court's record. (Hellings, J)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 91 Motion for Leave to Correspond with another Inmate signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/18/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Plaintiff's First 64 Motion for Summary Judgment be Deemed Superceded by Plaintiff's 84 Second Motion for Summary Judgment, Rendering the First Motion for Summary Judgment Moot; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/17/2018. referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Within Thirty Days 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/28/2018. (Hellings, J)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment be Stricken, with Leave to File a New Motion; Objections, if any, Due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/7/2018. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Sant Agata, S)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE Plaintiff's Notice that he does not wish to proceed against Defendants Arnett and Flores on Retaliation Claims in this case 78 ; Order for this case to continue to Proceed Only Against Defendants Johnson, Guzman, Gonzales and Sheldon on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment Claims for Unreasonable Unclothed Body Searches, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/01/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 68 Motion for Judge's assistance with Litigation signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/19/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING 67 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/08/2018. (Flores, E)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Adopting 62 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 27 Motion to Dismiss, and DENYING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Local Rule 110, or in the Alternative to Deem that Plaintiff Waived his Opposition signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/22/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim against Defendants Johnson, Guzman, Gonzales and Sheldon; and First Amendment retaliation claim against Defendants Guzman, Gonzales and Mars h; and Defendants Beard, Davey, Jennings, Whitford, Arnett, Noland and Flores be dismissed from this action, based on Plaintiff's failure to state any claims against them. re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Issac Da'bour Dawson ; referred to Judge Drozd,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/7/17. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and RECOMMENDING that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Local Rule 110, or in the Alternative, to deem that P laintiff waived his opposition and Grant Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss be DENIED re 27 MOTION to DISMISS filed by J. Gonzales, Johnson, T. Marsh, A. Guzman ; referred to Judge Drozd, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/20/17. Objections to F&R due by 11/9/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYING Request for Appointment of Counsel 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/19/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER VACATING 50 Findings and Recommendation Entered on August 18, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/21/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING Requests for Attorney's Fees, Appointment of Counsel, and Appointment of Expert Witness 51 ; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 27 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/31/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Case be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey Court Orders signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/17/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. (Flores, E)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Stay 43 ; ORDER VACATING Discovery and Scheduling Order August 1, 2017 46 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/6/17: A new Discovery and Scheduling Order shall be issued after the motion to dismiss, filed on July 20, 2017, is resolved. (Hellings, J)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 39 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Signature; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Submit a New Opposition Bearing his Signature within Fourteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/24/17. (Case Management Deadline: 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff Docket Sheet and Copy of ECF No. 27 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/2017. 21-day deadline. (Jessen, A)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to FILE Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, within Twenty-One Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for Defendants to Answer the Complaint Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/12/16.(Hellings, J)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Denying 14 Motion to Revoke in Forma Pauperis Status, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/8/16. (Verduzco, M)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's in Forma Pauperis Status 14 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/16: Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Finding Cognizable Claims and DISMISSING Remaining Claims and Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/23/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Commissioner of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Issac Da'bour Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Whitford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?